WV HB2300 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 131, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to regulate the use of step therapy protocols by providing a simple and expeditious process for exceptions to the protocols that the health care provider deems not in the best interests of the patient.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating step therapy protocols

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 161) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 8) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HouseChapter 131, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
2017-03-31HouseApproved by Governor 3/30/17 - House Journal
2017-03-31SenateApproved by Governor 3/30/17 - Senate Journal
2017-03-30HouseApproved by Governor 3/30/17
2017-03-25SenateTo Governor 3/24/17 - Senate Journal
2017-03-25HouseTo Governor 3/24/17 - House Journal
2017-03-24HouseTo Governor 3/24/17
2017-03-22HouseHouse received Senate message
2017-03-21SenateCompleted legislative action
2017-03-21SenateCommunicated to House
2017-03-21SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 161)
2017-03-21SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-21SenateOn 3rd reading
2017-03-20SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-20SenateOn 2nd reading
2017-03-18SenateRead 1st time
2017-03-18SenateOn 1st reading
2017-03-17SenateReported do pass
2017-02-23SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2017-02-23SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2017-02-23SenateIntroduced in Senate
2017-02-23SenateHouse Message received
2017-02-22HouseCommunicated to Senate
2017-02-22HousePassed House (Roll No. 8)
2017-02-22HouseRead 3rd time
2017-02-22HouseOn 3rd reading, House Calendar
2017-02-21HouseRead 2nd time
2017-02-21HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2017-02-20HouseRead 1st time
2017-02-20HouseOn 1st reading, House Calendar
2017-02-17HouseDo pass
2017-02-09HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced in House
2017-02-09HouseTo Health and Human Resources
2017-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33154oNew CodeSee Bill Text
33163aaNew CodeSee Bill Text
33247pNew CodeSee Bill Text
33258mNew CodeSee Bill Text
3325A8oNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback