WV HB2290 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 282, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Initiating a State Employment First Policy to facilitate integrated employment of disabled persons

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Initiating a State Employment First Policy to facilitate integrated employment of disabled persons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 321) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 232) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 60) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseChapter 282, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
2021-04-07HouseApproved by Governor 4/7/21
2021-04-08HouseApproved by Governor 4/7/21 - House Journal
2021-04-07SenateApproved by Governor 4/7/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-01HouseTo Governor 4/1/21
2021-04-01HouseTo Governor 4/1/21 - House Journal
2021-04-01SenateTo Governor 4/1/21 - Senate Journal
2021-03-31SenateHouse Message received
2021-03-30HouseCompleted legislative action
2021-03-30HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-30HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 321)
2021-03-30HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-03-29SenateSenate requests House to concur
2021-03-29SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 232)
2021-03-29SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-29SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-03-27SenateFinance Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-27SenateWorkforce Committee amendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
2021-03-27SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-27SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-03-26SenateRead 1st time
2021-03-26SenateOn 1st reading
2021-03-25SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2021-03-11SenateTo Finance
2021-03-11SenateReported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance
2021-03-01SenateTo Workforce
2021-03-01SenateTo Workforce then Finance
2021-03-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-02-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-02-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 60)
2021-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-25HouseRead 2nd time
2021-02-25HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-24HouseRead 1st time
2021-02-24HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-23HouseBy substitute, do pass
2021-02-18HouseTo House Government Organization
2021-02-18HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization
2021-02-10HouseTo House Workforce Development
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced in House
2021-02-10HouseTo Workforce Development then Government Organization
2021-02-10HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1810Q1New CodeSee Bill Text
1810Q2New CodeSee Bill Text
1810Q3New CodeSee Bill Text
1810Q4New CodeSee Bill Text
1810Q5New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2290&year=2021&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2290%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2290
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2290%20SUB.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2290
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2290%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2290
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2290%20H%20WD%20AMT.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2290%20H%20WD%20AM%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2290%20S%20WORK%20AMT%20_1%203-10.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2290%20S%20WF%20AM%20_1%203-10.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2290%20S%20FIN%20AM%20_1.htm
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=797075746
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=799680785
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=799680762
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=799680806
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=801582964
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00060.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/03-29-0232.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00321.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback