WV HB2274 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 178, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 178, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Commissioner of Corrections to enter into mutual aid agreements.
Title
Authorizing the Commissioner of Corrections to enter into mutual aid agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 163) (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 35) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 34) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 73) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 35) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 34) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 73) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 178, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | House | Approved by Governor 2/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-02-25 | House | Approved by Governor 2/25/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-02-26 | Senate | To Governor 2/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-02-25 | House | To Governor 2/25/15 |
2015-02-25 | House | To Governor 2/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-20 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 163) |
2015-02-20 | House | House concurred in Senate title amendment |
2015-02-20 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 35) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 34) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment, but first to Finance |
2015-02-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-13 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 73) |
2015-02-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2015-02-11 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2015-02-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-10 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2015-02-09 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2015-02-09 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-01-23 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-23 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2015-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB309 (Same As) 2015-02-06 - To Judiciary