WV HB2263 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 164, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Update the regulation of pharmacy benefit managers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Update the regulation of pharmacy benefit managers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 239) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 320) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 212) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 133) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 24) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseChapter 164, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
2021-04-09HouseApproved by Governor 4/9/21
2021-04-10HouseApproved by Governor 4/9/21 - House Journal
2021-04-09SenateApproved by Governor 4/9/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-05HouseTo Governor 4/5/21
2021-04-05HouseTo Governor 4/5/21 - House Journal
2021-04-05SenateTo Governor 4/5/21 - Senate Journal
2021-03-31HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-03-30SenateCompleted legislative action
2021-03-30SenateCommunicated to House
2021-03-30SenateSenate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 239)
2021-03-30SenateHouse Message received
2021-03-29HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-29HouseHouse adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 320)
2021-03-29HouseConference report received-House
2021-03-27SenateConference report filed - Senate
2021-03-26HouseConference report filed - House
2021-03-26HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-03-26SenateConferee(s) Weld replace conferee(s) Takubo
2021-03-25HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-03-25SenateTo conference
2021-03-25SenateCommunicated to House
2021-03-25SenateSenate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Maroney, Takubo, Stollings
2021-03-25SenateHouse Message received
2021-03-24HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-24HouseHouse conferees: Pack, J., Jeffries, D., Griffith
2021-03-24HouseHouse refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote)
2021-03-24HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-03-23SenateCommunicated to House
2021-03-23SenateSenate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
2021-03-23SenateHouse Message received
2021-03-19HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-19HouseHouse concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 212)
2021-03-19HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-03-16SenateSenate requests House to concur
2021-03-16SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 133)
2021-03-16SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-15SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 3/15/21
2021-03-15SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-03-12SenateCommittee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-12SenateMaroney Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-12SenateCommittee Amendment Reported
2021-03-12SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-12SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-03-11SenateRead 1st time
2021-03-11SenateOn 1st reading
2021-03-10SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2021-02-18SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2021-02-18SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-02-17HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-02-17HousePassed House (Roll No. 24)
2021-02-17HouseRead 3rd time
2021-02-17HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-16HouseRead 2nd time
2021-02-16HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-15HouseRead 1st time
2021-02-15HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-13HouseBy substitute, do pass
2021-02-10HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced in House
2021-02-10HouseTo Health and Human Resources
2021-02-10HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
335111New CodeSee Bill Text
335112New CodeSee Bill Text
33512Amended CodeCitation Text
33513Amended CodeCitation Text
33518Amended CodeCitation Text
33519Amended CodeCitation Text
5169Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2263&year=2021&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2263%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2263
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2263%20SUB.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2263
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2263%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2263
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2263%20S%20H_HR%20AM%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2263%20SFAT%20_1%20MARONEY%203-11.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2263%20SFA%20_1%20MARONEY%203-11.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2263%20SFA%20_1%20MARONEY%203-11%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2263%20S%20H_HR%20AM%20_1%20as%20amended.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2263%20HFA%20SUMMERS%203-17%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2263%20HFA%20SUMMERS%203-19%20_1.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00024.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/03-16-0133.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00212.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00320.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/03-30-0239.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback