WV HB2262 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amend who shall report and review the controlled substance monitoring database
Title
Relating to the controlled substance monitoring database
Sponsors
Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Guy Ward [R] |
Del. Doug Smith [R] | Del. Brandon Steele [R] | Del. Paul Espinosa [R] | Del. Evan Worrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 64) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 57) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 18) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 57) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 18) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/10/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/10/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/10/21 |
2021-03-04 | House | To Governor 3/4/21 |
2021-03-05 | House | To Governor 3/4/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-05 | Senate | To Governor 3/4/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-03-02 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 64) |
2021-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 57) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2021-02-17 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-17 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 18) |
2021-02-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-16 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-12 | House | Do pass |
2021-02-10 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-10 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60A | 9 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60A | 9 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |