WV HB2257 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2257
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to extended supervision for certain drug offenders
Title
Relating to extended supervision for certain drug offenders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 129) (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 126) (Y: 36 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2022-02-11 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 126) (Y: 36 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 129) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-11 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 126) |
2022-02-11 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-10 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-12 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2257 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - To Judiciary