WV HB2245 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 2219
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 2219
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Board of Examiners in Counseling to promulgate a legislative rule relating to Licensed Professional Counselor License Renewal and Continuing Professional Education Requirements.
Title
Counseling, W.Va. Board of Examiners in Licensed Professional Counselor License Renewal and Continuing Professional Education Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 2219 |
2017-02-21 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-09 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB101 (Similar To) 2017-02-08 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 9 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |