WV HB2218 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 2219
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Commissioner of Agriculture to promulgate a legislative rule relating to Dangerous Wild Animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture, Department of, Dangerous Wild Animals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22HouseReported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 2219
2017-02-22HouseTo House Judiciary
2017-02-22HouseDo pass, but first to Judiciary
2017-02-09HouseTo House Agriculture and Natural Resources
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced in House
2017-02-09HouseTo Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary
2017-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB83 (Similar To) 2017-02-08 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6491Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback