WV HB2204 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 122, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 122, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit state licensing boards from hiring lobbyists; and declare that the director and appointed board members of each board may lobby on behalf of the board.
Title
Prohibiting state licensing boards from hiring lobbyists
Sponsors
Del. Geoff Foster [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] | Del. Chris Phillips [R] | Del. Terry Waxman [R] |
Del. Stephen Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 298) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 297) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 91) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 297) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 91) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 122, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Approved by Governor 3/19/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-08 | Senate | To Governor 3/8/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/19 |
2019-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 298) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 297) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-08 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-08 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 91) |
2019-02-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-04 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-15 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-10 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |