WV HB2196 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-09 - Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to allow for the participation of home schooled students in certain secondary school activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the secondary schools athletic commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 523) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 585) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 487) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 210) (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-09SenateVetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal
2017-04-26HouseVetoed by Governor 4/26/17
2017-04-09HouseVetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal
2017-04-09SenateTo Governor 4/21/17 - Senate Journal
2017-04-21HouseTo Governor 4/21/17
2017-04-09HouseTo Governor 4/21/17 - House Journal
2017-04-08SenateCompleted legislative action
2017-04-08SenateCommunicated to House
2017-04-08SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 523)
2017-04-08SenateHouse Message received
2017-04-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2017-04-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 585)
2017-04-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2017-04-08SenateSenate requests House to concur
2017-04-08SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 487)
2017-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-08SenateOn 3rd reading
2017-04-07SenateRucker Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2017-04-07SenateMann Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2017-04-07SenateCommittee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2017-04-07SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2017-04-06SenateRead 1st time
2017-04-06SenateImmediate consideration
2017-04-06SenateReported do pass, with amendments
2017-03-29SenateTo Education
2017-03-29SenateTo Education
2017-03-29SenateIntroduced in Senate
2017-03-29SenateHouse Message received
2017-03-28HouseCommunicated to Senate
2017-03-28HousePassed House (Roll No. 210)
2017-03-28HouseRead 3rd time
2017-03-28HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2017-03-27HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2017-03-27HouseReported by the Clerk
2017-03-27HousePlaced at foot of 2nd reading
2017-03-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-03-27HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2017-03-25HouseRead 1st time
2017-03-25HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2017-03-24HouseBy substitute, do pass
2017-02-08HouseTo House Education
2017-02-08HouseIntroduced in House
2017-02-08HouseTo Education
2017-02-08HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18225Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2196&year=2017&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2196%20intr.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=RS&i=2196
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2196%20SUB.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=RS&i=2196
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2196%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=RS&i=2196
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2196%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=RS&i=2196
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/RS/votes/house/00210.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/RS/votes/senate/04-08-0487.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/RS/votes/house/00585.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/RS/votes/senate/04-08-0523.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback