WV HB2191 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Approved by Governor 2/25/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating generally to limited video lottery

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating generally to limited video lottery

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 121) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 121) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 41) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 40) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26HouseApproved by Governor 2/25/19 - House Journal
2019-02-25HouseApproved by Governor 2/25/19
2019-02-25SenateApproved by Governor 2/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-02-20SenateTo Governor 2/19/19 - Senate Journal
2019-02-19HouseTo Governor 2/19/19 - House Journal
2019-02-19HouseTo Governor 2/19/19
2019-02-13HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-02-12SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-02-12SenateCommunicated to House
2019-02-12SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 121)
2019-02-12SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 121)
2019-02-12SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-11SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 2/11/19
2019-02-11SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-08SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-07SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-07SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-06SenateReported do pass
2019-01-30SenateTo Finance
2019-01-30SenateTo Finance
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-30SenateHouse Message received
2019-01-29HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-01-29HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 41)
2019-01-29HousePassed House (Roll No. 40)
2019-01-29HouseRead 3rd time
2019-01-29HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-28HouseRead 2nd time
2019-01-28HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-25HouseRead 1st time
2019-01-25HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-24HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-01-15HouseTo House Finance
2019-01-15HouseDo pass, but first to Finance
2019-01-09HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-09HouseTo Judiciary then Finance
2019-01-09HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2922B1408Amended CodeCitation Text
2922B321Amended CodeCitation Text
2922B503Amended CodeCitation Text
2922B504Amended CodeCitation Text
2922B903Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback