WV HB2189 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to create the Protection of Property from Warrantless Searches Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To create the "Protection of Property from Warrantless Searches Act.”

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-11HouseOn 1st reading, House Calendar
2023-02-22HousePlaced on House Calendar
2023-02-22HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-21HouseBy substitute, do pass
2023-01-11HouseTo House Judiciary
2023-01-11HouseIntroduced in House
2023-01-11HouseTo Judiciary
2023-01-11HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
621A12New CodeSee Bill Text
621A13New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback