WV HB2185 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2185
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-21 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-21 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit removal of animals left unattended in motor vehicles. The bill defines terms. The bill sets forth conditions to rescue and retrieve an animal in danger in an unattended vehicle. The bill provides for written notice to the owner of the motor vehicle. The bill provides for payment of fees and costs associated with the maintenance, care and medical treatment of an animal. The bill limits search of a motor vehicle during rescue. The bill provides for seizure of items found in certain circumstances. The bill provides for civil and criminal immunity to persons, their employees or agents who retrieve an animal. The bill provides for criminal penalties.
Title
Relating to the removal of animals left unattended in motor vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 7) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-18 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 7) |
2019-01-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-15 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2019-01-15 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-01-09 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-09 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2185 (Carry Over) 2019-01-21 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 8 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |