WV HB2183 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 262, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 262, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to make clear that a charge of DUI may only be brought against an individual operating a vehicle on public highways or on private roads before or after entering or exiting a public highway.
Title
Clarifying where a charge of DUI may be brought against an individual
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 437) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 329) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 6) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 329) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 6) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 262, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/9/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/9/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/9/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 437) |
2019-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 329) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2019-01-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-17 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 6) |
2019-01-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-14 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-09 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-09 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |