WV HB2161 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to adopt the Uniform Act on Prevention of and Remedies for Human Trafficking by creating a Commission on the Prevention of Human Trafficking; requiring the public posting of hotline information in certain business and public locations; making services available to victims of human trafficking; providing victims immunity from criminal prosecution for certain crimes directly resulting from human trafficking; changing the definition of human trafficking; expanding criminal remedies and enforcement tools to combat human trafficking and allowing victims to petition the circuit court to vacate and expunge a conviction for certain crimes directly resulting from human trafficking.
Title
Adopting the Uniform Act on Prevention of and Remedies for Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 606) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 227) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 227) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-27 | House | To Governor 3/27/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/27/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 606) |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 10) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 3/10/15 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance |
2015-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-27 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 227) |
2015-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-27 | House | Amended on 3rd reading |
2015-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-24 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2015-02-24 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-01-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-20 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2015-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 14 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 14 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 14 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 14 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 14 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 14 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 2 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 2 | 17a | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 2 | 17b | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 1D | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |