WV HB211 | 2010 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - Chapter 9, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to allow more counties to apply to participate in the military and overseas voting pilot program for the 2010 general election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing more counties to apply to participate in the military and overseas voting pilot program for the 2010 general election

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 500) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 499) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-30 Chapter 9, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2010
2010-07-21 Approved by Governor 7/26/10 - House Journal
2010-07-26 Approved by Governor 7/26/10
2010-07-21 Approved by Governor 7/26/10 - Senate Journal
2010-07-26 To Governor 7/26/10
2010-07-21 To Governor 7/26/10 - House Journal
2010-07-21 House received Senate message
2010-07-21 Completed legislative action
2010-07-21 Communicated to House
2010-07-21 Effective from passage (Roll No. 3)
2010-07-21 Passed Senate (Roll No. 3)
2010-07-21 Read 3rd time
2010-07-21 On 3rd reading
2010-07-21 Read 2nd time
2010-07-21 Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 2)
2010-07-21 On 2nd reading
2010-07-21 Read 1st time
2010-07-21 On 1st reading
2010-07-21 Immediate consideration
2010-07-21 Reported do pass
2010-07-21 To Judiciary
2010-07-21 Introduced in Senate
2010-07-21 Communicated to Senate
2010-07-21 Effective from passage (Roll No. 500)
2010-07-21 Passed House (Roll No. 499)
2010-07-21 Read 3rd time
2010-07-21 On 3rd reading, House Calendar
2010-07-20 Read 2nd time
2010-07-19 On 2nd reading, House Calendar
2010-07-19 Read 1st time
2010-07-19 Immediate consideration
2010-07-19 Do pass
2010-07-19 To House Finance
2010-07-19 Do pass, but first to Finance
2010-07-17 To House Judiciary
2010-07-17 Introduced in House
2010-07-17 To Judiciary then Finance
2010-07-17 Filed for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2011 (Same As) 2010-07-17 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33B3Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback