WV HB2088 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2088
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Removed from calendar by Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Removed from calendar by Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow admission of evidence in a civil action of the use or nonuse of a safety belt on the issues of negligence, contributory negligence, comparative negligence and failure to mitigate damages.
Title
Relating to admissibility of certain evidence in a civil action for damages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 348) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Motion Previous Question adopted (Roll No. 347) (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Motion to reconsider adopted (Roll No. 346) (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House rejected (Roll No. 305) (Y: 45 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - Motion Previous Question adopted (Roll No. 347) (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Motion to reconsider adopted (Roll No. 346) (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House rejected (Roll No. 305) (Y: 45 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Senate | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 348) |
2020-02-26 | House | Motion Previous Question adopted (Roll No. 347) |
2020-02-26 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted (Roll No. 346) |
2020-02-25 | House | House rejected (Roll No. 305) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2088 (Carry Over) 2019-01-09 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 15 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text |