WV HB2064 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-27 - To Economic Development
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-27 - To Economic Development
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish the Tourism and Commercial Opportunity Zone Tax Credit Act. The bill provides for a short title. The bill provides for legislative findings and purpose. The bill creates definitions. The bill establishes the Tourism and Commercial Opportunity Zone tax credit. The bill provides for restrictions on investment. The bill provides for a penalty. The bill provides for the disclosure of tax credit. The bill provides for tax credit review and accountability. The bill creates rules. Finally, the bill provides for an effective date.
Title
To create commercial opportunity zones to attract new businesses to West Virginia
Sponsors
Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. Eric Brooks [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-25 - House - Effective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 255) (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 254) (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 254) (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2023-02-27 | Senate | To Economic Development then Finance |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-25 | House | Effective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 255) |
2023-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 254) |
2023-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-01-11 | House | To House Economic Development and Tourism |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-11 | House | To Economic Development and Tourism |
2023-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13PP | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13PP | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13PP | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13PP | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13PP | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13PP | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13PP | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13PP | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13PP | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13PP | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8A | 7 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |