WV HB206 | 2010 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-20 - Tabled on 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to encourage teacher collaboration through the establishment of alternative school-level decision-making bodies. The bill creates a process for schools to apply to the state board to create collaborative teams or augment existing collaborative teams by replacing the three existing teams required by state board rule. The bill also requires the state board to study all currently required school committees and teams and to report to the Legislative Oversight Commission on Education Accountability and the Joint Standing Committee on Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging teacher collaboration through the establishment of alternative school-level decision-making bodies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-20 Tabled on 3rd reading, House Calendar
2010-07-20 Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2010-07-20 Read 2nd time
2010-07-19 On 2nd reading, House Calendar
2010-07-19 Read 1st time
2010-07-19 On 1st reading, House Calendar
2010-07-18 With amendment, do pass
2010-07-17 To House Education
2010-07-17 Introduced in House
2010-07-17 To Education
2010-07-17 Filed for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2006 (Same As) 2010-07-30 - Chapter 7, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2010

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18238New CodeSee Bill Text
185C1New CodeSee Bill Text
185C2New CodeSee Bill Text
185C3New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback