WV HB2050 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-10 - Removed from calendar by Rules Committee
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-10 - Removed from calendar by Rules Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase the number of members on the West Virginia Route 2 and Interstate 68 Authority from 20 to 26 and expand the Authority's territory to include Cabell, Mason and Jackson counties.
Title
Expanding the counties covered by West Virginia Route 2 and Interstate 68 Authority to include Cabell, Mason and Jackson counties; and increasing the number of members
Sponsors
Del. Kevin Craig [D] | Del. Jim Morgan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-10 | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee | |
2009-04-10 | On 3rd reading with right to amend | |
2009-04-09 | Unanimous consent | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-09 | On 2nd reading | |
2009-04-08 | Read 1st time | |
2009-04-08 | On 1st reading | |
2009-04-08 | Immediate consideration | |
2009-04-08 | Reported do pass | |
2009-03-23 | To Government Organization | |
2009-03-23 | To Government Organization | |
2009-03-23 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-03-20 | Communicated to Senate | |
2009-03-20 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 76) | |
2009-03-20 | Passed House (Roll No. 75) | |
2009-03-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-20 | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-03-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-20 | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 74) | |
2009-03-20 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-20 | On 1st reading, Local Calendar | |
2009-03-18 | Do pass | |
2009-02-11 | To House Government Organization | |
2009-02-11 | Introduced in House | |
2009-02-11 | To Government Organization | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB13 (Same As) 2009-03-02 - To Government Organization
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2050&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |