WV HB2029 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 69, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 69, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove the authority provided to the Department of Health and Human Resources to establish and maintain an all-payor claims database.
Title
Repealing the creation of an all-payer claims database
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 120) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 120) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 16) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 15) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 120) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 16) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 15) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 69, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-02-13 | House | Approved by Governor 2/13/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Approved by Governor 2/13/2023 - House Journal |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/13/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-02-07 | House | To Governor 2/7/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | To Governor 2/7/2023 - House Journal |
2023-02-08 | Senate | To Governor 2/7/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-02-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 120) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 120) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-01-31 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-01-30 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-01-20 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-20 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-01-19 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 16) |
2023-01-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 15) |
2023-01-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-01-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-01-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-01-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-16 | House | Do pass |
2023-01-11 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-11 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2519 (Similar To) 2023-01-12 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 4A | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 4A | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 4A | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 4A | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 4A | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 4A | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 4A | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 4A | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |