WV HB2026 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 85, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 85, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide an additional, one-time opportunity for municipal police officers to transfer from the Public Employees Retirement System into the West Virginia Municipal Police Officers and Firefighters Retirement System.
Title
Authorizing municipalities with police or firefighter employees in PERS to elect to become participating employer in Municipal Police Officer and Firefighter Retirement System for a limited time
Sponsors
Del. Wayne Clark [R] | Del. Chuck Horst [R] | Del. Mike Honaker [R] | Del. Trenton Barnhart [R] |
Del. Evan Worrell [R] | Del. Paul Espinosa [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 618) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 754) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 536) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 288) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 754) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 536) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 288) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 85, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-20 | House | To Governor 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/20/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 618) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 754) |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 536) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Weld floor amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Nelson amend to Weld amend adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Weld floor amendment reported |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rearranged on Calendar by Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/9/2023 with right to amend |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/8/2023 with right to amend |
2023-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2023-02-28 | Senate | To Pensions |
2023-02-28 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 288) |
2023-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-02-15 | House | To House Finance |
2023-02-15 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2023-01-11 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-11 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2023-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |