WV HB2017 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - To House Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Rewriting the Criminal Code

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rewriting the Criminal Code

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 375) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 386) (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 344) (Y: 46 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-30 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 343) (Y: 24 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseTo House Judiciary
2021-04-08HouseTo Judiciary
2021-04-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-04-08SenateSenate requests House to concur
2021-04-08SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 375)
2021-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-08SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-04-07SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-04-07SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-04-06SenateRead 1st time
2021-04-06SenateOn 1st reading
2021-04-05SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2021-04-01SenateTo Judiciary
2021-04-01SenateTo Judiciary
2021-04-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-03-31HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-31HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-31HousePassed House (Roll No. 386)
2021-03-31HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-31HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-31HouseAmendment reported by the Clerk
2021-03-31HousePlaced at foot of bills on third reading
2021-03-31HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-30HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-30HouseAmendment to amendment adopted (Voice)
2021-03-30HouseAmendment to amendment rejected
2021-03-30HouseAmendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 344)
2021-03-30HouseAmendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 343)
2021-03-30HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-30HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-29HouseRead 1st time
2021-03-29HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-26HouseBy substitute, do pass
2021-02-10HouseTo House Judiciary
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced in House
2021-02-10HouseTo Judiciary
2021-02-10HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15128Amended CodeCitation Text
30299aNew CodeSee Bill Text
55223New CodeSee Bill Text
6111Amended CodeCitation Text
6112Amended CodeCitation Text
6113Amended CodeCitation Text
6114Repealed CodeCitation Text
6115Repealed CodeCitation Text
6117Repealed CodeCitation Text
6118Repealed CodeCitation Text
6119Repealed CodeCitation Text
6121Amended CodeCitation Text
61210aRepealed CodeCitation Text
61210bRepealed CodeCitation Text
61211Amended CodeCitation Text
61212Amended CodeCitation Text
61213Amended CodeCitation Text
61214Amended CodeCitation Text
61214aRepealed CodeCitation Text
61214bRepealed CodeCitation Text
61214cRepealed CodeCitation Text
61214dRepealed CodeCitation Text
61214eRepealed CodeCitation Text
61214fRepealed CodeCitation Text
61214gRepealed CodeCitation Text
61214hRepealed CodeCitation Text
61215Amended CodeCitation Text
61215aRepealed CodeCitation Text
61216Amended CodeCitation Text
61216aRepealed CodeCitation Text
61217New CodeSee Bill Text
61218New CodeSee Bill Text
61219New CodeSee Bill Text
6122Amended CodeCitation Text
61220New CodeSee Bill Text
61221New CodeSee Bill Text
61222New CodeSee Bill Text
61223New CodeSee Bill Text
61224New CodeSee Bill Text
61225New CodeSee Bill Text
61226Repealed CodeCitation Text
61227Repealed CodeCitation Text
61227aRepealed CodeCitation Text
61228Repealed CodeCitation Text
61229Repealed CodeCitation Text
61229aRepealed CodeCitation Text
61229bRepealed CodeCitation Text
6123Amended CodeCitation Text
61230Repealed CodeCitation Text
6124Amended CodeCitation Text
6125Amended CodeCitation Text
6125aRepealed CodeCitation Text
6126Amended CodeCitation Text
6127Amended CodeCitation Text
6128Amended CodeCitation Text
6129Amended CodeCitation Text
6129aRepealed CodeCitation Text
6129bRepealed CodeCitation Text
6129cRepealed CodeCitation Text
6129dRepealed CodeCitation Text
6131Amended CodeCitation Text
61310New CodeSee Bill Text
61311Amended CodeCitation Text
61312Amended CodeCitation Text
61313Amended CodeCitation Text
61314Amended CodeCitation Text
61315Amended CodeCitation Text
61316Amended CodeCitation Text
61317New CodeSee Bill Text
61318Amended CodeCitation Text
61319Amended CodeCitation Text
6132Amended CodeCitation Text
61320Amended CodeCitation Text
61320aRepealed CodeCitation Text
61321Amended CodeCitation Text
61322Amended CodeCitation Text
61322aRepealed CodeCitation Text
61323Amended CodeCitation Text
61324Amended CodeCitation Text
61324aRepealed CodeCitation Text
61324bRepealed CodeCitation Text
61324cRepealed CodeCitation Text
61324dRepealed CodeCitation Text
61324eRepealed CodeCitation Text
61324fRepealed CodeCitation Text
61324gRepealed CodeCitation Text
61324hRepealed CodeCitation Text
61325Amended CodeCitation Text
61326Amended CodeCitation Text
61327Amended CodeCitation Text
61328Amended CodeCitation Text
61329Amended CodeCitation Text
6133Amended CodeCitation Text
61330Amended CodeCitation Text
6134Amended CodeCitation Text
6135Amended CodeCitation Text
6136Amended CodeCitation Text
6137Amended CodeCitation Text
6138Amended CodeCitation Text
6139New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2017&year=2021&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2017%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2017
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2017%20SUB.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2017
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2017%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2017
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2017%20SUB%20ENG2.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2017
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2017%20HFA%20CAPITO%203-30%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2017%20HFA%20YOUNG%20_%20FLEISCHAUER%203-30%20_2.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2017%20HFA%20YOUNG%20_%20FLEISCHAUER%203-30%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2017%20HFA%20FLUHARTY,%20YOUNG%20_%20FLEISCHAUER%203-30.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2017%20HFA%20PUSHKIN%203-30.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2017%20HFA%20GARCIA%203-30.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2017%20HFA%20LINVILLE%20AND%20STEELE%203-31%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2017%20HFAT%20CAPITO%203-31.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2017%20S%20JUD%20AMT%20_1%204-1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2017%20S%20JUD%20AM%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2017%20S%20JUD%20AM%20_1%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2017%20S%20JUD%20AMT%20_1%204-1%20adopted.htm
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=798490920
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00343.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00344.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00386.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/04-08-0375.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback