WV HB2013 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 99, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 99, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Hope Scholarship Program
Title
Relating to the Hope Scholarship Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 144) (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 86) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 85) (Y: 22 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 84) (Y: 24 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 83) (Y: 24 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 82) (Y: 24 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 81) (Y: 29 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 80) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 33) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 31) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 30) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 29) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 86) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 85) (Y: 22 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 84) (Y: 24 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 83) (Y: 24 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 82) (Y: 24 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 81) (Y: 29 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 80) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 33) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 31) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 30) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 29) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 99, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/21 |
2021-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-22 | House | To Governor 3/22/21 |
2021-03-23 | House | To Governor 3/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-23 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-18 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 144) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-16 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-15 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-10 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2021-03-05 | Senate | To Education |
2021-03-05 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-04 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 86) |
2021-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-04 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 85) |
2021-03-04 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 84) |
2021-03-04 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 83) |
2021-03-04 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 82) |
2021-03-04 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 81) |
2021-03-04 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 80) |
2021-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | Amendment pending |
2021-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-02 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2021-02-19 | House | Recommitted to Finance on 3rd reading |
2021-02-19 | House | House reconsidered passage (Voice) |
2021-02-19 | House | House reconsidered title amendment and withdrew |
2021-02-19 | House | House reconsidered its action |
2021-02-18 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 33) |
2021-02-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-17 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-02-17 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 31) |
2021-02-17 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2021-02-17 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 30) |
2021-02-17 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 29) |
2021-02-17 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-02-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-12 | House | To House Finance |
2021-02-12 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2021-02-10 | House | To House Education |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-10 | House | To Education then Finance |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 31 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 31 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 31 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 31 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 31 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 31 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 31 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 31 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 31 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 31 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 31 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 31 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 31 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 8 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 8 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |