WV HB2011 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 210, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminating any time requirements for part time personnel to work during a working year

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminating any time requirements for part time personnel to work during a working year

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 167) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 166) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 126) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 126) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 22) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseChapter 210, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
2021-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/24/21 - House Journal
2021-03-24HouseApproved by Governor 3/24/21
2021-03-24SenateApproved by Governor 3/24/21 - Senate Journal
2021-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/18/21 - House Journal
2021-03-18HouseTo Governor 3/18/21
2021-03-19SenateTo Governor 3/18/21 - Senate Journal
2021-03-17SenateHouse Message received
2021-03-16HouseCompleted legislative action
2021-03-16HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-16HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 167)
2021-03-16HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 166)
2021-03-16HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-03-15SenateSenate requests House to concur
2021-03-15SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 126)
2021-03-15SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 126)
2021-03-15SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-15SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-03-12SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-12SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-12SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-03-11SenateRead 1st time
2021-03-11SenateOn 1st reading
2021-03-10SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2021-02-18SenateTo Government Organization
2021-02-18SenateTo Government Organization
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-02-17HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-02-17HousePassed House (Roll No. 22)
2021-02-17HouseRead 3rd time
2021-02-17HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-16HouseRead 2nd time
2021-02-16HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-15HouseRead 1st time
2021-02-15HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-13HouseBy substitute, do pass
2021-02-10HouseTo House Government Organization
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced in House
2021-02-10HouseTo Government Organization
2021-02-10HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2964Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2011&year=2021&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2011%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2011
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2011%20SUB.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2011
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2011%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2011
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2011%20S%20GOV%20AMT%20_1%203-8.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2011%20S%20GOV%20AM%20_1.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00022.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/03-15-0126.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00166.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00167.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback