WV HB2008 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 282, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 282, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require all local entities of this state to enforce immigration laws. The bill provides for definitions. The bill protects the taxpayers of West Virginia by ensuring that municipalities and counties in West Virginia are immediately required to contact the United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement to identify where noncitizen residents are residing, so that the matter of their illegal status is resolved in the Courts. Finally, the bill prohibits discrimination while enforcing immigration laws and prohibiting sanctuary cities in West Virginia.
Title
Requiring local entities to enforce immigration laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 614) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 759) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 535) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 72) (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 759) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 535) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 72) (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 282, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-22 | House | To Governor 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/22/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 614) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 759) |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 535) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rearranged on Calendar by Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2023-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Judiciary |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Without recommendation, but first rereferred to Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 72) |
2023-02-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-03 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-03 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2023-02-03 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2023-02-03 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2023-02-03 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2023-02-03 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2023-02-03 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2023-02-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-31 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-01-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-12 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 15 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 15 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 15 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 15 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 15 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 15 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 15 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 15 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 15 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |