WV HB2008 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 169, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amending requirements for licensure relating to elevator mechanics, crane operators, HVAC, electricians, and plumbers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending requirements for licensure relating to elevator mechanics, crane operators, HVAC, electricians, and plumbers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 185) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 184) (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 143) (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 134) (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 47) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 45) (Y: 28 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-19 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 44) (Y: 31 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-19 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 43) (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseChapter 169, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
2021-03-29SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/21 - Senate Journal
2021-03-27HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/21
2021-03-29HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/21 - House Journal
2021-03-22HouseTo Governor 3/22/21
2021-03-23HouseTo Governor 3/22/21 - House Journal
2021-03-23SenateTo Governor 3/22/21 - Senate Journal
2021-03-19SenateHouse Message received
2021-03-18HouseCompleted legislative action
2021-03-18HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-18HousePassed House (Roll No. 185)
2021-03-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 184)
2021-03-18HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-03-17SenateSenate requests House to concur
2021-03-17SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 143)
2021-03-17SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-17SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-03-16SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Roll No. 134)
2021-03-16SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-16SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-03-15SenateRead 1st time
2021-03-15SenateOn 1st reading
2021-03-12SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2021-02-23SenateTo Government Organization
2021-02-23SenateTo Government Organization
2021-02-23SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-02-22HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-02-22HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-02-22HousePassed House (Roll No. 47)
2021-02-22HouseRead 3rd time
2021-02-22HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-19HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 45)
2021-02-19HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 44)
2021-02-19HouseAmendment adopted (Roll No. 43)
2021-02-19HouseRead 2nd time
2021-02-19HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-18HouseRead 1st time
2021-02-18HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-17HouseBy substitute, do pass
2021-02-10HouseTo House Government Organization
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced in House
2021-02-10HouseTo Government Organization
2021-02-10HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21142Amended CodeCitation Text
21147Amended CodeCitation Text
211611New CodeSee Bill Text
21162Amended CodeCitation Text
21163Amended CodeCitation Text
21165Amended CodeCitation Text
21168Amended CodeCitation Text
213C14New CodeSee Bill Text
213D1Amended CodeCitation Text
213D2Amended CodeCitation Text
213D3Amended CodeCitation Text
213D4Repealed CodeCitation Text
213D5Repealed CodeCitation Text
213D6Repealed CodeCitation Text
213D7Repealed CodeCitation Text
213D8Amended CodeCitation Text
213D9Repealed CodeCitation Text
293B2Amended CodeCitation Text
293B3Amended CodeCitation Text
293B4Amended CodeCitation Text
293B6Amended CodeCitation Text
293B8Amended CodeCitation Text
293D2Amended CodeCitation Text
293D3Amended CodeCitation Text
293D4Amended CodeCitation Text
293D6Amended CodeCitation Text
293D7Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2008&year=2021&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2008%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2008
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2008%20SUB.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2008
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2008%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2008
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2008%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2008
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2008%20HFA%20CRISS%202-19%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2008%20DISERIO%20HFA%202-19%20_2%20rejected.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2008%20HFA%20DISERIO%202-19%20_1%20rejected.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2008%20HFAT%20STEELE%202-21%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2008%20S%20GOV%20AMT%20_1%203-8.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2008%20S%20GOV%20AM%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2008%20S%20GOV%20AM%20_1%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2008%20S%20GOV%20AMT%20_1%203-8%20adopted.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00043.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00044.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00045.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00047.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/03-16-0134.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/03-17-0143.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00184.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00185.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback