WV HB2008 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2008
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide that when no candidate receives a majority of votes cast in the nonpartisan election of justices of the Supreme Court of Appeals; a runoff election is to be held within 30 days.
Title
Relating to nonpartisan election of justices of the Supreme Court of Appeals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2019-01-22 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2019-01-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-21 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 1/22/19 |
2019-01-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-17 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-15 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2008 (Carry Over) 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 1 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |