WV HB2007 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 233, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 233, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit certain medical practices.
Title
Prohibiting certain medical practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 622) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 752) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 569) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Takubo floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 568) (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 71) (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 69) (Y: 12 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 68) (Y: 11 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 752) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 569) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Takubo floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 568) (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 71) (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 69) (Y: 12 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 68) (Y: 11 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 233, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-22 | House | To Governor 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/22/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 622) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 752) |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Judiciary committee title amendment adopted |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 569) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rucker floor amendments not germane |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rucker floor amendments reported |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Takubo floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 568) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | HHR committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Deferred until foot of bills |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 2nd reading |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rearranged on Calendar by Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2023-03-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments, but first to Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-06 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 71) |
2023-02-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-02 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 69) |
2023-02-02 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 68) |
2023-02-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-31 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-01-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-01-20 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2023-01-12 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-12 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2023-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 14 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 3 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |