WV HB2005 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 162, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 162, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide more transparent healthcare costs to West Virginians, and in doing so provide a review process by the Attorney General’s office for nonprofit hospitals, regulate out-of-state healthcare providers and non-network facility based providers, list disclosures of a healthcare facility and publication of a carrier’s network, further define the responsibilities of a carrier inadvertent to out of state network services, provide binding arbitration for payment disputes, healthcare savings cost calculations, violations and legislative rules, provide for price transparency and a publication of prices, and provide the cost of healthcare appointment prices.
Title
Relating to health care costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 531) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 374) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 15) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 374) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 15) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 162, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/22/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-22 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 531) |
2021-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 374) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 4/7/21 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 4/5/21 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2021-02-17 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-17 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 15) |
2021-02-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-16 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-10 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-10 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |