WV HB2005 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a special method for valuation of certain wireless technology property for property taxes; establish Public Service Commission jurisdiction over make-ready pole access within the state; and establish the West Virginia Small Wireless Facilities Deployment Act.
Title
Broadband Expansion Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 29) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-29 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-28 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 29) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-28 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2019-01-28 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-28 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-01-28 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 1-28-19 |
2019-01-25 | House | Placed at foot of 3rd reading |
2019-01-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-24 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 1/25/19 |
2019-01-24 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-23 | House | Amendments pending |
2019-01-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-17 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-14 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-14 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 6L | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 6L | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 6L | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 6L | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 6L | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 6L | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31G | 4 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31G | 4 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31H | 1 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31H | 1 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31H | 2 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31H | 2 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31H | 2 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31H | 2 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |