WV HB2003 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-02 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-02 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify the authority and obligations of the Governor and Legislature relating to declared states of preparedness and emergencies; clarifying the authority of the Governor; providing requirements for any proclamation or resolution so issued; and providing directives for lawsuits filed challenging actions taken pursuant to the authority granted herein.
Title
Relating to the authority and obligations of the Governor and Legislature when in declared states of preparedness and emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 283) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 283) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 36) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 35) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 34) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 283) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 36) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 35) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 34) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-01 | House | To conference |
2021-04-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-01 | House | House appointed conferees: Summers, Pack, J., Brown |
2021-04-01 | House | House agreed to conference |
2021-04-01 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Trump, Clements, Baldwin |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2021-03-31 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 283) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 283) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Judiciary Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Ihlenfeld Amendment to committee amend withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Judiciary Committee Amendment Reported |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Government Organization Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2021-03-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2021-03-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary |
2021-02-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-02-22 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-02-19 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 36) |
2021-02-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-18 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 35) |
2021-02-18 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No. 34) |
2021-02-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-02-17 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-02-17 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |