WV HB2001 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 248, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to create a partial state income tax exemption for Social Security benefits received by taxpayers with federal adjusted gross income under $100,000 if married filing jointly, or under $50,000 if single or married filing separately. The exemption would be phased in to a full exemption over 3 years. For taxable years beginning in 2020, 25 percent of the Social Security benefits are exempt; in 2021, 50 percent, and in 2022 and thereafter, 100 percent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to exempting social security benefits from personal income tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 676) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 675) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - Motion for previous question rejected (Roll No. 674) (Y: 15 N: 81 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 393) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 61) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseChapter 248, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-27SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-27HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
2019-03-21HouseTo Governor 3/21/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/21/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/21/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HousePassed House (Roll No. 676)
2019-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 675)
2019-03-09HouseMotion for previous question rejected (Roll No. 674)
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-07SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 393)
2019-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-07SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-03-06SenateCommittee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-06SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-03-05SenateRead 1st time
2019-03-05SenateOn 1st reading
2019-03-04SenateReported do pass, with amendments and title amendment
2019-02-04SenateTo Finance
2019-02-04SenateTo Finance
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-04SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-01HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-01HousePassed House (Roll No. 61)
2019-02-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-01HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-31HouseRead 2nd time
2019-01-31HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-30HouseRead 1st time
2019-01-30HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-29HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-01-11HouseTo House Finance
2019-01-11HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-11HouseTo Finance
2019-01-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2220 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - To House Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
112112Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2001&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2001%20intr.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2001
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2001%20SUB.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2001
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2001%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2001
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00061.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-07-0393.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00674.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00675.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00676.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback