WV HB2001 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 94, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 94, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modify the ethics and purchasing laws to provide more transparency in government.
Title
Relating to ethics and transparency in government
Sponsors
Del. Charlotte Lane [R] | Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] | Del. Riley Moore [R] | Del. Kayla Kessinger [R] |
Del. Nancy Foster [R] | Del. Eric Householder [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 584) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 245) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 18) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 245) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 18) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 94, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 584) |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Floor Title amendment adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Judiciary Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 245) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/27/17 with right to amend |
2017-03-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2017-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 18) |
2017-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-02-14 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-14 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 3 | 10f | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6B | 2 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6B | 2 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6B | 2 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6B | 2 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6B | 2 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6B | 2 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6B | 2 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6D | 1 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6D | 1 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6D | 1 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6D | 1 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |