WV HB192 | 2019 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to encourage out-of-state educational professionals to apply and work in West Virginia by removing certificate fees.
Title
Removing certain fees for teaching
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 881) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Senate | To Education |
2019-06-24 | Senate | To Education |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-06-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-06-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 881) |
2019-06-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-06-19 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2019-06-18 | House | Amendments pending |
2019-06-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-06-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-06-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-06-17 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-06-17 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-06-17 | House | To House Select Committee on Education Reform D |
2019-06-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-06-17 | House | To Select Committee on Education Reform D |
2019-06-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 3 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |