WV HB143 | 2023 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-08 - Placed on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this supplemental appropriation bill is to add a new item of appropriation in the aforesaid account for the designated spending unit for expenditure during the fiscal year 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplementing and amending the appropriations to the Department of Health and Human Resources

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-08HousePlaced on House Calendar
2023-08-08HouseOn 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar
2023-08-07HouseRead 2nd time
2023-08-07HouseImmediate consideration
2023-08-07HouseDo pass
2023-08-06HouseTo House Finance
2023-08-06HouseCommitted to Finance on 2nd reading
2023-08-06HouseRead 1st time
2023-08-06HouseImmediate consideration
2023-08-06HouseIntroduced in House
2023-08-06HouseTo Finance
2023-08-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1043 (Similar To) 2023-08-29 - Chapter 25, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2023

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback