WV HB118 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Chapter 7, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Chapter 7, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Environmental Protection, Air Quality, rule relating to standards of performance for new stationary sources (45 CSR 16)
Title
Department of Environmental Protection, Air Quality, rule relating to standards of performance for new stationary sources (45 CSR 16)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 18) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 18) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 17) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 693) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 692) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 691) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 18) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 17) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 693) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 692) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 691) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | House | Chapter 7, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2016 |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 6/8/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-06-11 | House | Approved by Governor 6/8/16 - House Journal |
2016-06-08 | House | Approved by Governor 6/8/16 |
2016-06-11 | Senate | To Governor 6/7/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-06-11 | House | To Governor 6/7/16 - House Journal |
2016-06-07 | House | To Governor 6/7/16 |
2016-06-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 18) |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 18) |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 17) |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-06-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-06-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-06-02 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 693) |
2016-06-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 692) |
2016-06-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-06-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-06-02 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 691) |
2016-06-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-06-02 | House | Immediate consideration |
2016-06-02 | House | Do pass |
2016-06-02 | House | Originating in House Judiciary |