WV HB117 | 2019 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide reduced rates for low-income residential customers of privately-owned water, sewer or combined water and sewer utilities.
Title
Relating to reduced rates for low-income residential customers of privately owned sewer and combined water and sewer utilities
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 50) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 49) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 775) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 774) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 49) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 775) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 774) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - House Journal |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-05-29 | House | Approved by Governor 5/29/19 |
2019-06-01 | Senate | To Governor 5/24/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-05-24 | House | To Governor 5/24/19 |
2019-06-17 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 50) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 49) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 775) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 774) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-05-20 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-05-20 | House | Reference dispensed |
2019-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1003 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - To Rules
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13 | 3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 13F | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 13F | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 13F | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 24 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 3 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |