WV HB116 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Chapter 10, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Chapter 10, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Governor to issue executive orders to furlough state employees and pay certain debt obligations in the event of a fiscal emergency.
Title
Authorizing the Governor to direct payment of certain state debt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 722) (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 721) (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 720) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 31) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 31) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 30) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 705) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 704) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-12 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 703) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 721) (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 720) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 31) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 31) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 30) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 705) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 704) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-12 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 703) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | House | Chapter 10, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2016 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 6/17/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-06-14 | House | Approved by Governor 6/17/16 - House Journal |
2016-06-17 | House | Approved by Governor 6/17/16 |
2016-06-15 | House | To Governor 6/15/16 |
2016-06-14 | House | To Governor 6/15/16 - House Journal |
2016-06-14 | Senate | To Governor 6/15/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-06-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-06-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-06-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-06-14 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 722) |
2016-06-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 721) |
2016-06-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 31) |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 31) |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 30) |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-06-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-06-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-06-12 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 705) |
2016-06-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 704) |
2016-06-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-06-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-06-12 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 703) |
2016-06-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-06-12 | House | Immediate consideration |
2016-06-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-06-01 | House | To House Finance |
2016-06-01 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2016-05-31 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-05-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-05-31 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2016-05-31 | House | Filed for introduction |