WV HB115 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Budget Bill
Title
Budget Bill
Sponsors
Del. Tim Miley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | House | Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-06-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-06-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-06-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-06-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-06-13 | House | Immediate consideration |
2017-06-13 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-05-23 | House | To House Finance |
2017-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-05-23 | House | To Finance |
2017-05-23 | House | Filed for introduction |