WV HB112 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Tabled on 1st reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Tabled on 1st reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to extend the Volunteer Fire Department Workers' Compensation Premium Subsidy Fund untill June 30, 2020.
Title
Relating to the Volunteer Fire Department Workers' Compensation
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | House | Tabled on 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-06-05 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2017-06-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-05-24 | House | With title amendment, do pass |
2017-05-23 | House | To House Finance |
2017-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-05-23 | House | To Finance |
2017-05-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1010 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Chapter 7, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2017
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 3 | 33a | Amended Code | Citation Text |