WV HB108 | 2014 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Chapter 8, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Chapter 8, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is establish a regulatory system for sexual assault forensic examinations.
Title
Establishing a regulatory system for sexual assault forensic examinations
Sponsors
Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Tim Armstead [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 18) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 17) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 517) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 516) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 17) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 517) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 516) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Chapter 8, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2014 |
2014-03-31 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-28 | House | To Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 533) |
2014-03-14 | House | House reconsidered passage (Voice) |
2014-03-14 | House | House reconsidered its action |
2014-03-14 | House | Motion to reconsider |
2014-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 532) |
2014-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 18) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 17) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 517) |
2014-03-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-14 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 516) |
2014-03-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-14 | House | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-14 | House | Reference dispensed |
2014-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 9B | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 9B | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 9B | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |