WV HB106 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-16 - Resolution adopted to extend conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-16 - Resolution adopted to extend conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating generally to the furlough of public employees during declared fiscal emergency
Title
Relating generally to the furlough of public employees during declared fiscal emergency
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 39) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 39) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 38) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 617) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 616) (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 615) (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 39) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 38) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 617) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 616) (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 615) (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | House | Resolution adopted to extend conference |
2017-06-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-06-13 | House | To conference |
2017-06-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-06-13 | House | House appointed conferees: Shott, Hanshaw, Lovejoy |
2017-06-13 | House | House agreed to conference |
2017-06-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Trump, Swope, Romano |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-06-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-06-13 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2017-06-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 39) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Floor Title amendment adopted |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 39) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 38) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-06-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-06-12 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2017-05-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-05-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-05-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-05-18 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 617) |
2017-05-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 616) |
2017-05-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-18 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 615) |
2017-05-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-05-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-05-17 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-05-16 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-05-16 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-05-15 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-05-15 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2017-05-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1005 (Similar To) 2017-05-16 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 2 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 3 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 30 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 30 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 30 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 30 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 30 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 30 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 3 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |