WV HB106 | 2011 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Vetoed by Governor 8/17/11 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to reapportion the House of Delegates as a result of the 2010 census.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reapportioning the House of Delegates districts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-08-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-05 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 5) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 533) (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 532) (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-05 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 531) (Y: 26 N: 71 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-05 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 530) (Y: 34 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-05 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 529) (Y: 34 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-04 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 511) (Y: 39 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-08-03 - House - Motion to substitute minority report for the report of the House Select Committee on Redistricting rejected (Roll No. 510) (Y: 36 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-08-05 Vetoed by Governor 8/17/11 - House Journal
2011-08-17 Vetoed by Governor 8/17/11
2011-08-05 Vetoed by Governor 8/17/11 - Senate Journal
2011-08-05 To Governor 8/17/11 - House Journal
2011-08-17 To Governor 8/17/11
2011-08-05 To Governor 8/17/11 - Senate Journal
2011-08-05 Completed legislative action
2011-08-05 House received Senate message
2011-08-05 Communicated to House
2011-08-05 Effective from passage (Roll No. 7)
2011-08-05 Passed Senate (Roll No. 6)
2011-08-05 Read 3rd time
2011-08-05 On 3rd reading
2011-08-05 Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote)
2011-08-05 Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote)
2011-08-05 Read 2nd time
2011-08-05 Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 5)
2011-08-05 On 2nd reading
2011-08-05 Read 1st time
2011-08-05 On 1st reading
2011-08-05 Committee reference dispensed
2011-08-05 Immediate consideration
2011-08-05 Introduced in Senate
2011-08-05 House Message received
2011-08-05 Communicated to Senate
2011-08-05 Effective from passage (Roll No. 533)
2011-08-05 Passed House (Roll No. 532)
2011-08-05 Read 3rd time
2011-08-05 Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
2011-08-05 Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2011-08-05 Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2011-08-05 Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2011-08-05 Amendment rejected (Roll No. 531)
2011-08-05 Amendment rejected (Voice vote)
2011-08-05 Amendment rejected (Roll No. 530)
2011-08-05 Amendment rejected (Voice vote)
2011-08-05 Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2011-08-05 Amendment ruled not germane
2011-08-05 Amendment rejected (Roll No. 529)
2011-08-05 Amendment rejected (Voice vote)
2011-08-05 Amendment rejected (Voice vote)
2011-08-05 Amendment reported by the Clerk
2011-08-05 On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, House Calendar
2011-08-04 Amendments pending
2011-08-04 Amendment rejected (Roll No. 511)
2011-08-04 Read 2nd time
2011-08-04 On 2nd reading, House Calendar
2011-08-03 Read 1st time
2011-08-03 Motion to substitute minority report for the report of the House Select Committee on Redistricting rejected (Roll No. 510)
2011-08-03 On 1st reading, House Calendar
2011-08-02 With accompanying minority report, do pass
2011-08-02 Originating in House Select Committee on Redistricting

Same As/Similar To

SB1006 (Similar To) 2011-08-29 - Chapter 6, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2011

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
122bAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=106&year=2011&sessiontype=1X&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb106%20eng.htm&yr=2011&sesstype=1X&i=106
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb106%20enr.htm&yr=2011&sesstype=1X&i=106
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb106%20intr.htm&yr=2011&sesstype=1X&i=106
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/house/00510.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/house/00511.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/house/00529.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/house/00530.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/house/00531.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/house/00532.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/house/00533.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/senate/08050005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/senate/08050006.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/senate/08050007.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback