WV HB104 | 2014 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Chapter 1, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Chapter 1, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase the cap for collections into the Land Division special revenue account of the Department of Agriculture from $1.5 million to $2 million and to divide amounts in excess of the cap evenly between the special revenue account and the General Revenue Fund of the State.
Title
Increasing the annual cap for collections into the Land Division special revenue account of the Department of Agriculture
Sponsors
Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Tim Armstead [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 11) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 509) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 508) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 11) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 509) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 508) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Chapter 1, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2014 |
2014-03-31 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-28 | House | To Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 11) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 509) |
2014-03-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-14 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 508) |
2014-03-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-14 | House | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-14 | House | Reference dispensed |
2014-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 12A | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |