WV HB103 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-16 - Tabled on 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-16 - Tabled on 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to rename conservation officers as natural resources police officers, to rename the chief conservation officer as the chief natural resources police officer and to clarify that certain provisions of the West Virginia Code are inapplicable to the pensions of natural resource police officers paid through the Public Employees Retirement System.
Title
Renaming conservation officers as natural resources police officers, chief conservation officer as chief natural resources police officer and clarifying the effect of nomenclature changes on pensions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-16 | Tabled on 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2010-05-16 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2010-05-15 | Laid over on 3rd reading, House Calendar, until 5/16/10 | |
2010-05-15 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2010-05-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-05-14 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2010-05-13 | Read 1st time | |
2010-05-13 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-05-13 | Reference dispensed | |
2010-05-13 | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1003 (Same As) 2010-06-07 - Chapter 15, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2010