WV HB102 | 2011 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-05 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to clarify the authorization of the Higher Education Policy Commission to sell, lease or convey property and to designate where proceeds are to be deposited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying the requirement for deposit and transfer of proceeds from the sale of real property

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-08-05 On 3rd reading, House Calendar
2011-08-04 Read 2nd time
2011-08-04 On 2nd reading, House Calendar
2011-08-03 Read 1st time
2011-08-03 Immediate consideration
2011-08-03 With title amendment, do pass
2011-08-01 To House Finance
2011-08-01 Introduced in House
2011-08-01 To Finance
2011-08-01 Filed for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1003 (Same As) 2011-08-29 - Chapter 4, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2011

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18B1910Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback