WI SR7 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Senator Cowles added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Senator Cowles added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: acknowledging that the Communist Party of China deliberately and intentionally misled the world on the Wuhan Coronavirus and standing in solidarity with the Chinese people to condemn the actions of the Communist Party of China.
Title
Acknowledging that the Communist Party of China deliberately and intentionally misled the world on the Wuhan Coronavirus and standing in solidarity with the Chinese people to condemn the actions of the Communist Party of China.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Roth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor |
2020-04-03 | Senate | Senators Bernier and Jacque added as coauthors |
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/resolution/sr7 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SR7.pdf |