WI SJR90 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: congratulating the 2017 Wisconsin Badgers football team on the impressive accomplishments for this season.
Title
Congratulating the 2017 Wisconsin Badgers football team on the impressive accomplishments for this season.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Laid on table |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/joint_resolution/sjr90 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SJR90.pdf |