WI SJR87 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-4)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the life and public service of Gerald D. Kleczka.
Title
Honoring the life and public service of Gerald D. Kleczka.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 19 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 3-15-2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Concurred in |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2018-02-20 | House | Read |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Bewley, Cowles, Craig, Darling, Feyen, Fitzgerald, Kapenga, LeMahieu, Marklein, Moulton, Olsen, Petrowski, Roth, Schachtner, Stroebel, Testin, Tiffany, Vukmir and Wanggaard of the Senate added as coauthors |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Adopted by unanimous rising vote |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a coauthor |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 2-20-2018 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Introduced |